THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 10:21:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 242 King Street
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Quinte West Ontario K8V 5S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-392-2540
Extension: 5467
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Quinte Health Care - Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 242 King Street
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
Quinte West Ontario K8V 5S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-392-2540
Extension: 5467
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Quinte Health Care - Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Aug 2023
23 Aug 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 24 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 23 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JAMIE MARIE DAVIS may practise emergency medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Quinte Health Care - Trenton Memorial Hospital in Trenton, Ontario; and

(ii) Quinte Health Care - Belleville General Hospital in Belleville, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DAVIS’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. DAVIS’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. DAVIS’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 August, 2023, and will expire on or before 23 August, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JAMIE MARIE DAVIS may practise emergency medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Quinte Health Care - Trenton Memorial Hospital in Trenton, Ontario; and

(ii) Quinte Health Care - Belleville General Hospital in Belleville, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DAVIS’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. DAVIS’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. DAVIS’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 August, 2023, and will expire on or before 23 August, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 23 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 23 Aug 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023