THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Interdepartmental Division of Critical Care Medicine
Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB-121
595 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Interdepartmental Division of Critical Care Medicine
Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB-121
595 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jun 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 15 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Varsha Venkataraman may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and critical care medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Varsha Venkataraman may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and critical care medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2022