THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:51:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KFSH
dammam dammam 32242
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KFSH
dammam dammam 32242
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWAN MOUSA FARHAN AL-OMARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL-OMARI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AL-OMARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-OMARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL-OMARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL-OMARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL-OMARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAWAN MOUSA FARHAN AL-OMARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL-OMARI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AL-OMARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-OMARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL-OMARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL-OMARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL-OMARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Aug 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Hematology
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2021