THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Yaman, Hatice İnci (Used Until: 28 Jan 2021)
Medical School: Hacettepe University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Yaman, Hatice İnci (Used Until: 28 Jan 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hacettepe University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HATICE İNCI YAMAN BAJIN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. YAMAN BAJIN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. YAMAN BAJIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YAMAN BAJIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YAMAN BAJIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. YAMAN BAJIN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. YAMAN BAJIN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 15 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HATICE İNCI YAMAN BAJIN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. YAMAN BAJIN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. YAMAN BAJIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YAMAN BAJIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YAMAN BAJIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. YAMAN BAJIN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. YAMAN BAJIN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 15 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hacettepe University, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Dec 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
16 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
16 Dec 2024 to 15 Dec 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 15 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 16 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 16 Dec 2024 to 15 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021