THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:35:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MACEDONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network: Centenary hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network: General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network: Birchmount Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MACEDONIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network: Centenary hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network: General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network: Birchmount Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR TRAJKOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAJKOVSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR TRAJKOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAJKOVSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2021