THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:11:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: North Bengal Medical College, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: North Bengal Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: North Bengal Medical College, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
25 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Palliative Medicine
02 Sep 2021 to 24 Nov 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 25 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 25 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Palliative Medicine
DATE: 02 Sep 2021 to 24 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2021