THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:42:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Padova, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Padova, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Apr 2024
31 Jul 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 10 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jul 31 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARCO SOLMI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SOLMI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. SOLMI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 03 September, 2021, and expires on 31 July, 2029. Upon renewal of Dr. SOLMI's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARCO SOLMI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SOLMI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. SOLMI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 03 September, 2021, and expires on 31 July, 2029. Upon renewal of Dr. SOLMI's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Padova, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jul 2029
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2029

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2021