THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:14:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hashemite University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Hashemite University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hashemite University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2022 to 20 Aug 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
08 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
16 Aug 2021 to 07 Nov 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 20 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 08 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
DATE: 16 Aug 2021 to 07 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2021