THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:00:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Meharry Medical College, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7181 Yonge Street
Unit 28 - 29
Thornhill ON L3T 2A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-707-7309
Fax: 1-888-979-6305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Meharry Medical College, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7181 Yonge Street
Unit 28 - 29
Thornhill ON L3T 2A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-707-7309
Fax: 1-888-979-6305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HODAN ISMAIL may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HODAN ISMAIL may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Meharry Medical College, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 May 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2021