THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Al Rayyan Road
al-Rumaylah 21
al-Dawhah
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Al Gharafah Street
Azghouwa
al-Rayyan Qatar
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Al Rayyan Road
al-Rumaylah 21
al-Dawhah
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Al Gharafah Street
Azghouwa
al-Rayyan Qatar
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAA MOHD AL-NAAMA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL-NAAMA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL-NAAMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-NAAMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL-NAAMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL-NAAMA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL-NAAMA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAA MOHD AL-NAAMA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL-NAAMA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. AL-NAAMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-NAAMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL-NAAMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL-NAAMA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL-NAAMA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
University of Ottawa
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
22 Nov 2021 to 17 Dec 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 24 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Aug 2023 to 23 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 22 Nov 2021 to 17 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2021