THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:05:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ezeokoli, Chinwe Ugochi (Used Until: 31 Jan 2024)
Medical School: University of the West Indies Faculty of Medicine St. Augustine, Trinidad, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Ezeokoli, Chinwe Ugochi (Used Until: 31 Jan 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies Faculty of Medicine St. Augustine, Trinidad, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINWE UGOCHI EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 7 April, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINWE UGOCHI EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. EZEOKOLI-ASHRAPH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 7 April, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies Faculty of Medicine St. Augustine, Trinidad, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 07 Apr 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
20 Feb 2025 to 07 Apr 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
22 Jun 2024 to 19 Feb 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
14 May 2024 to 21 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
08 Apr 2024 to 13 May 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 07 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 20 Feb 2025 to 07 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 22 Jun 2024 to 19 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 14 May 2024 to 21 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 08 Apr 2024 to 13 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 07 Apr 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 07 Apr 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2024