THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MULTAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MULTAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. MULTAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MULTAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MULTAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MULTAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MULTAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MULTAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MULTAN is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. MULTAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MULTAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MULTAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MULTAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MULTAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 15 Jan 2025
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
 
Michael Multan was found guilty of the following offence:
 
1.    Having over 80mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
 
Date:  January 15, 2025 

SENTENCE:  1 year driving prohibition; Highway Traffic Act Caution; $2,500 Fine
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 15 Jan 2025
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
 
Michael Multan was found guilty of the following offence:
 
1.    Having over 80mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
 
Date:  January 15, 2025 

SENTENCE:  1 year driving prohibition; Highway Traffic Act Caution; $2,500 Fine
 

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
EL - Forensic Pathology
31 May 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Forensic Pathology
DATE: 31 May 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2021