THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:52:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
Internal Medicine
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-3301
Extension: 481
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Internal Medicine
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Dec 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Richmond Park Dr
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
Internal Medicine
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-3301
Extension: 481
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Internal Medicine
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Dec 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE GIOVANNA PIPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE GIOVANNA PIPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2021