THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:55:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 18 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 May 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 May 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2021