THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: Saini, Saumya (Used Until: 09 Apr 2021)
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Polyclinic Family and Specialty Medicine Facility
B17-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 29 Nov 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saumya M. Seidler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 May 2025

General Information

Former Name: Saini, Saumya (Used Until: 09 Apr 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, HINDI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Polyclinic Family and Specialty Medicine Facility
B17-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 29 Nov 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saumya M. Seidler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 May 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 05 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAUMYA MINI SEIDLER may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAUMYA MINI SEIDLER may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2021