THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:05:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hickey, Kala (Used Until: 11 Apr 2021)
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

General Information

Former Name: Hickey, Kala (Used Until: 11 Apr 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALA ELIZABETH HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALA ELIZABETH HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021