THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Poonam Chanchal (Used Until: 21 Apr 2021)
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Singh, Poonam Chanchal (Used Until: 21 Apr 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
07 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2023 to 06 Jul 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
07 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
EL - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jul 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 07 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 06 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 07 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021