THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Westmount Road North
Unit D1
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-743-9360
Fax: 519-743-6710
Address: 100 Pertosa Drive
suite 104
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 451-1244
Fax: (905) 451-6955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Westmount Road North
Unit D1
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-743-9360
Fax: 519-743-6710
Address: 100 Pertosa Drive
suite 104
Brampton Ontario L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 451-1244
Fax: (905) 451-6955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERIMA VILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERIMA VILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021