THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:47:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main St W
McMaster University
The Department of Pathology and Molecular Medicine
Health Sciences Centre, Room 3N26D
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main St W
McMaster University
The Department of Pathology and Molecular Medicine
Health Sciences Centre, Room 3N26D
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER YOUSEF shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YOUSEF is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. YOUSEF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YOUSEF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YOUSEF shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YOUSEF is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YOUSEF no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER YOUSEF shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YOUSEF is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. YOUSEF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YOUSEF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. YOUSEF shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YOUSEF is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YOUSEF no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
19 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
01 Jul 2025 to 18 Aug 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
19 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
01 Jul 2024 to 09 Aug 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 19 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 18 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 19 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 09 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021