THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:10:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE CHARLESWORTH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHARLESWORTH is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. CHARLESWORTH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHARLESWORTH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHARLESWORTH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHARLESWORTH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHARLESWORTH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 16 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE CHARLESWORTH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHARLESWORTH is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. CHARLESWORTH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHARLESWORTH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHARLESWORTH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHARLESWORTH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHARLESWORTH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 16 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 16 Jun 2026
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
17 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 16 Dec 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
22 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 21 Nov 2022
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
14 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
AVP - Family Medicine
15 Feb 2022 to 13 Jun 2022
Queen's University
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 16 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 17 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 16 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 22 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 21 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 14 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 15 Feb 2022 to 13 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 16 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 16 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021