Medical School:
Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
29 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
22 Oct 2024 to 07 Apr 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
Queen's University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
29 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
22 Oct 2024 to 07 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University