THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: Attalla, Monica Said Saad Botros (Used Until: 10 Oct 2024)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Kingston Road
Building E
Suite 200 B
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-420-9999
Fax: 905-420-0863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Attalla, Monica Said Saad Botros (Used Until: 10 Oct 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Kingston Road
Building E
Suite 200 B
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-420-9999
Fax: 905-420-0863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA BOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCTOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA BOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCTOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021