THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 00:34:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Dec 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Dec 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Dec 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 19 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHRISTINA GONZALEZ TORRES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of General Psychiatry, Division of Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 December, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHRISTINA GONZALEZ TORRES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of General Psychiatry, Division of Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 December, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. GONZALEZ TORRES's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2021