THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:57:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Dundas Street West
KJK Walk-In Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166574403
Fax: 3652022520
Address: 1279 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 3V7
Phone: (905) 625-1344
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 101-320 Matheson Boulevard West
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3R1
Phone: (647) 577-1553
Fax: (647) 777-6118
Address: 1700 Wilson Avenue
Sheridan Clinic
Toronto Ontario M3L 1B2
Phone: 4162449178
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Dundas Street West
KJK Walk-In Clinic
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166574403
Fax: 3652022520
Address: 1279 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 3V7
Phone: (905) 625-1344
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 101-320 Matheson Boulevard West
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3R1
Phone: (647) 577-1553
Fax: (647) 777-6118
Address: 1700 Wilson Avenue
Sheridan Clinic
Toronto Ontario M3L 1B2
Phone: 4162449178
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021