THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:12:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Albert Street
Parry Sound Ontario P2A 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAH MADIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADIGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAH MADIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADIGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021