THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:51:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Adolescent Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Adolescent Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAN CLAIRE CORET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAN CLAIRE CORET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2021