THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:03:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SERBIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSA ZUBIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUBIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSA ZUBIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUBIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021