THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:11:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715180 Oxford Road 4
Woodstock Ontario N4S 7V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 228 1708
Fax: (519) 421 1057
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421 4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 715180 Oxford Road 4
Woodstock Ontario N4S 7V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 228 1708
Fax: (519) 421 1057
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421 4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MICHAEL REGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MICHAEL REGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021