THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 20:46:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTEN WRIGHT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WRIGHT is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. WRIGHT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WRIGHT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. WRIGHT shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WRIGHT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WRIGHT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTEN WRIGHT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WRIGHT is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. WRIGHT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WRIGHT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. WRIGHT shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WRIGHT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WRIGHT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
13 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2025 to 12 Jan 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
14 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
27 Aug 2024 to 13 Jan 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 13 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 12 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 14 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 27 Aug 2024 to 13 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021