THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:24:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: Stephenson, Michelle Lynne (Used Until: 12 May 2021)
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Adelaide St S
Prisma Health Care Collaborative
London ON N5Z 3L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198788621
Fax: 5199134045
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

General Information

Former Name: Stephenson, Michelle Lynne (Used Until: 12 May 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Adelaide St S
Prisma Health Care Collaborative
London ON N5Z 3L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198788621
Fax: 5199134045
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LYNNE LEPITRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPITRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE LYNNE LEPITRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPITRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021