THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:41:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: Moralis, Sophia Linda Elizabeth (Used Until: 10 May 2021)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Phone: 807-737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

General Information

Former Name: Moralis, Sophia Linda Elizabeth (Used Until: 10 May 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Phone: 807-737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA MORALIS FROST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA MORALIS FROST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021