THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 21:58:43 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Emergency Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
Emergency Medicine
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Emergency Medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
Emergency Medicine
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 May 2025
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 06 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MOHAMED MOHAMED ALI shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MOHAMED ALI is enrolled at the Western University.

(2) In Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MOHAMED ALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MOHAMED ALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MOHAMED ALI shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. MOHAMED ALI may practise:

(a) Emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at Four Counties Health Services Newbury, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(b) Emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at Woodstock Hospital,, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(c) Adult Critical Care medicine and to the extent of their employment at London Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) In the intensive care unit and to the extent of their employment at St. Joseph's Health Care London, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. MOHAMED ALI may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. MOHAMED ALI must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. MOHAMED ALI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. MOHAMED ALI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. MOHAMED ALI must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. MOHAMED ALI to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. MOHAMED ALI takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. MOHAMED ALI may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. MOHAMED ALI applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MOHAMED MOHAMED ALI shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MOHAMED ALI is enrolled at the Western University.

(2) In Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MOHAMED ALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MOHAMED ALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MOHAMED ALI shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. MOHAMED ALI may practise:

(a) Emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at Four Counties Health Services Newbury, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(b) Emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at Woodstock Hospital,, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(c) Adult Critical Care medicine and to the extent of their employment at London Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) In the intensive care unit and to the extent of their employment at St. Joseph's Health Care London, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. MOHAMED ALI may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. MOHAMED ALI must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. MOHAMED ALI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. MOHAMED ALI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. MOHAMED ALI must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. MOHAMED ALI to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. MOHAMED ALI’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. MOHAMED ALI takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. MOHAMED ALI may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. MOHAMED ALI applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021