Medical School:
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology |
15 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jan 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology |
16 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jan 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine |
16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jan 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine |
17 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 16 Jan 2023 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
12 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2021 to 11 Apr 2022 |
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
DATE:
15 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE:
16 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
17 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 16 Jan 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
12 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 11 Apr 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University