THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:28:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: Piccininni, Caroline Rose (Used Until: 19 Dec 2022)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
QHC Belleville General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Station St
Quinte Dermatology
Suite 205
Belleville ON K8N 2S9
Phone: 6137711910
Extension: 6
Fax: 6137070470
Address: 242 King St
QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Trenton ON K8V 3X1
Phone: 6133922540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

General Information

Former Name: Piccininni, Caroline Rose (Used Until: 19 Dec 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
QHC Belleville General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Station St
Quinte Dermatology
Suite 205
Belleville ON K8N 2S9
Phone: 6137711910
Extension: 6
Fax: 6137070470
Address: 242 King St
QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Trenton ON K8V 3X1
Phone: 6133922540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ROSE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE ROSE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021