THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:28:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-35 Victoria Avenue
Essex Ontario N8M 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199619299
Fax: 5199619297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2025
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-35 Victoria Avenue
Essex Ontario N8M 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199619299
Fax: 5199619297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2025
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMMAIYA NAJUM SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMMAIYA NAJUM SIDDIQUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022