THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:36:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Children's Hospital
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Children's Hospital
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Jul 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 24 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MOSHIRA MAHRAN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MAHRAN is enrolled at Western University.

(2) In Dr. MAHRAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MAHRAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MAHRAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. MAHRAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MAHRAN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. MAHRAN may practise:

(a) pediatric intensive care unit and to the extent of HER employment at London Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) pediatric subspecialty inpatient service and to the extent of HER employment at London Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. MAHRAN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. MAHRAN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. MAHRAN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. MAHRAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. MAHRAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. MAHRAN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MAHRAN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MAHRAN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. MAHRAN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. MAHRAN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. MAHRAN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. MAHRAN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. MAHRAN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MOSHIRA MAHRAN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MAHRAN is enrolled at Western University.

(2) In Dr. MAHRAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MAHRAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MAHRAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. MAHRAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. MAHRAN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. MAHRAN may practise:

(a) pediatric intensive care unit and to the extent of HER employment at London Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) pediatric subspecialty inpatient service and to the extent of HER employment at London Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. MAHRAN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. MAHRAN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. MAHRAN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. MAHRAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. MAHRAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. MAHRAN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MAHRAN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MAHRAN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. MAHRAN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. MAHRAN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. MAHRAN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. MAHRAN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. MAHRAN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
10 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 09 May 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
10 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2023 to 09 May 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
10 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2022 to 09 May 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
10 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
24 Sep 2021 to 09 May 2022
Western University
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 09 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 09 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 09 May 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 10 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2021 to 09 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021