THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:05:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHELSEA JOSEPHINE ARN-CHING CHENG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHENG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHENG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHENG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHENG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHENG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHENG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHELSEA JOSEPHINE ARN-CHING CHENG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHENG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHENG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHENG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHENG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHENG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHENG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
24 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
AVP - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021