THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:21:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: O.O.Bogomolets National Medical Un, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 278 Metcalfe St W
West Middlesex Health Centre
Strathroy ON N7G 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-3590
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Emergency Department
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: O.O.Bogomolets National Medical Un, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 278 Metcalfe St W
West Middlesex Health Centre
Strathroy ON N7G 1N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-3590
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Emergency Department
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA LAVASOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVASOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA LAVASOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVASOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: O.O.Bogomolets National Medical Un, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021