Medical School:
University of Benin, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics |
05 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University |
AVP - Pediatrics |
01 Jul 2021 to 04 Nov 2021 |
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE:
05 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Pediatrics
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 04 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY:
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University