THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: Podnos, Anna (Used Until: 07 Dec 2021)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Podnos, Anna (Used Until: 07 Dec 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 14 Mar 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
15 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 14 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 15 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Mar 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2022