THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 361 Main St E
Unit 101
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-0605
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 361 Main St E
Unit 101
Hawkesbury ON K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-0605
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS BRUNET-FILION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNET-FILION is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS BRUNET-FILION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNET-FILION is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021