THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:48:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Emergency Department
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Emergency Department
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MARIE ALVINE BRUNET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MARIE ALVINE BRUNET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021