Medical School:
All Saints University College of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery |
11 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 10 Nov 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
05 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 04 Nov 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
30 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Ottawa |
AVP - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2021 to 29 Nov 2021 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE:
11 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 10 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
05 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 04 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
30 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
AVP - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 29 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa