THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:08:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Feb 2025
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 13 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. BRIAN RICHARD EARL shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EARL is enrolled at the University of Ottawa.

(2) In Dr. EARL’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. EARL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EARL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. EARL’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. EARL shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. EARL may practise:

(a) pediatrics and to the extent of his employment at Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) medicine in the pediatrics intensive care unit and to the extent of his employment at Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. EARL’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. EARL may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. EARL must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. EARL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. EARL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. EARL must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. EARL’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. EARL’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. EARL to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. EARL’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. EARL takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. EARL may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. EARL applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. BRIAN RICHARD EARL shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EARL is enrolled at the University of Ottawa.

(2) In Dr. EARL’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. EARL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EARL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. EARL’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. EARL shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. EARL may practise:

(a) pediatrics and to the extent of his employment at Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) medicine in the pediatrics intensive care unit and to the extent of his employment at Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. EARL’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. EARL may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. EARL must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. EARL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. EARL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. EARL must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. EARL’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. EARL’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. EARL to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. EARL’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. EARL takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. EARL may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. EARL applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021