THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:42:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Nephrology
10 Mar 2025 to 06 Apr 2025
Western University
EL - Pediatric Respirology
10 Feb 2025 to 09 Mar 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 10 Mar 2025 to 06 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Respirology
DATE: 10 Feb 2025 to 09 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021