THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:37:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAWSON JAMES OVERTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. OVERTON is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. OVERTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OVERTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. OVERTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. OVERTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. OVERTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 19 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAWSON JAMES OVERTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. OVERTON is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. OVERTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OVERTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. OVERTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. OVERTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. OVERTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 19 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
20 Dec 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 19 Dec 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
20 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 19 Dec 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
20 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 19 Dec 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
20 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 19 Dec 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 20 Dec 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 19 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 20 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 19 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 20 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 19 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 20 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 19 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 19 Dec 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 19 Dec 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021