THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:20:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PATRICK CHRISTIE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHRISTIE is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. CHRISTIE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHRISTIE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHRISTIE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHRISTIE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHRISTIE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PATRICK CHRISTIE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHRISTIE is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. CHRISTIE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHRISTIE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHRISTIE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHRISTIE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHRISTIE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021