THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:26:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences (Administrative Office) Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences (Administrative Office)
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200-25 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences (Administrative Office) Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences (Administrative Office)
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Jan 2025
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 21 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA PATRICIA NIEUWESTEEG shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NIEUWESTEEG is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. NIEUWESTEEG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NIEUWESTEEG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. NIEUWESTEEG shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. NIEUWESTEEG may practise medicine in the neonatal intensive care unit and to the extent of their employment at McMaster Children's Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. NIEUWESTEEG may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. NIEUWESTEEG must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. NIEUWESTEEG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. NIEUWESTEEG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. NIEUWESTEEG must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. NIEUWESTEEG to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. NIEUWESTEEG takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. NIEUWESTEEG may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. NIEUWESTEEG applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA PATRICIA NIEUWESTEEG shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NIEUWESTEEG is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. NIEUWESTEEG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NIEUWESTEEG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. NIEUWESTEEG shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. NIEUWESTEEG may practise medicine in the neonatal intensive care unit and to the extent of their employment at McMaster Children's Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. NIEUWESTEEG may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. NIEUWESTEEG must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. NIEUWESTEEG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. NIEUWESTEEG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. NIEUWESTEEG must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. NIEUWESTEEG to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. NIEUWESTEEG’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. NIEUWESTEEG takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. NIEUWESTEEG may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. NIEUWESTEEG applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
AVP - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021