THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Taber Road
Toronto Ontario M9W 3A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167440066
Extension: 1
Fax: 4167441881
Address: 850 King St E
Hamilton ON L8M 1B4
Phone: 905-526-7137
Fax: 905-526-7969

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Taber Road
Toronto Ontario M9W 3A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167440066
Extension: 1
Fax: 4167441881
Address: 850 King St E
Hamilton ON L8M 1B4
Phone: 905-526-7137
Fax: 905-526-7969

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMITA MALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMITA MALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021