THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
21 Nov 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
25 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 24 Oct 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 21 Nov 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 25 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 24 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021